Trustees THE PUSHKIN TRUST
Charity number: 801214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS MCCAUL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robert David Bolton | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Hamilton | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Stewart | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEREK BROWN | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gregg Berry KC | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE ORR | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROF PAUL SEAWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NINO TORADZE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.