ST ETHELDREDA ART STUDIO

Charity number: 801562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.20k £7.47k £7.60k £9.00k £26.56k
Total expenditure £6.49k £7.17k £7.70k £11.31k £7.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.91k