Trustees THE RICHMOND THEATRE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 801610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Poxon | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Pollard | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire McCormack | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Bird | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Euan Shearer | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Dixon | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Bleddyn Phillips | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Trinder | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Glick | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Karin Gartzke | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.