Trustees BATH FESTIVALS
Charity number: 801617
Charity reporting is up to date (99 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID CULLUM | Chair | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clavell Stanley Hall | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Donovan | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Tessa Armstrong | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Cusack | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elaine Smith | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Alistair Graham Singleton | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suresh Prabha Ariaratnam | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Denise Rogers | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christoper David Rogers | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD TIMMIS TURNER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.