Financial history THANET AND DISTRICT SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES

Charity number: 801859
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.20k £7.15k £9.34k £7.34k £6.30k
Total expenditure £7.50k £7.14k £6.22k £5.93k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A