ST AUBYN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 801930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.50k £0 £6.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.27k £1.40k £1.80k £1.25k £70
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A