Trustees THE NORFOLK GARDENS TRUST
Charity number: 801984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW THOMAS MARTIN | Chair | 26 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Keri Lee Williams | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MARCUS WARREN | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Talbot | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Lloyd | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan ROE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Caroline Anne Keene | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth MOORE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Louise BATE | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER IAN LAST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM INNES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.