FRIENDS OF THE ABBEY JMI SCHOOL

Charity number: 802214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £20.02k £24.93k £24.59k £26.65k £16.78k
Total expenditure £22.62k £20.87k £27.19k £27.87k £15.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A