THE MERYEMANA FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 802312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £120 £528 £10.69k £1 £0
Total expenditure £121 £121 £90 £431 £301
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A