Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE SPAFFORD CHILDREN'S CENTER OF JERUSALEM
Charity number: 802351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANK SPENCER-NAIRN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sophia Lopresti | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Connie Musallam | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Bristow | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||
DAVID CAUSER | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Ingleby | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Partridge | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Sentance | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Ingleby | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS SPENCER-NAIRN | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
BECKETT VESTER | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACOB DAJANI | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
LADY DJEMILA LOVELL COPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK VESTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABIR TUQAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAID SHEHADEH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TESSA INGLEBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR AHMED MASSOUD MD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.