Governing document The Puffins Club (Dacorum Sports Club for Adults with Learning Disabilities)
Charity number: 802505
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1981 AS AMENDED 21ST NOVEMBER 1989, 18TH MARCH 2000, 23RD NOVEMBER 2001 AND 18TH NOVEMBER 2005. as amended on 01 Dec 2018 as amended on 30 Nov 2019 as amended on 14 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORT IN PARTICULAR IN THE DISTRICT OF DACORUM FOR PEOPLE HAVING A PHYSICAL, SENSORY OR MENTAL DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE DISTRICT OF DACORUM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.