GOWLING WLG (UK) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 803009
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £106.15k £108.15k £110.24k £162.52k £162.64k
Total expenditure £108.94k £108.67k £125.88k £147.16k £139.04k