Trustees GADS HILL SCHOOL
Charity number: 803153
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIRSTY HILLOCKS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Melanie Sarah Taylor | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Martin | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dijana Piralic | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDRA JEAN CLARABUT | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Aaron Andrew O'Brien | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kevin Savage | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Barker | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER BASI | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS WHITTINGTON | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILIP GILCHRIST MYATT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARION DICKENS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.