Trustees MOON HALL SCHOOLS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 803481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Turner | Chair | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Grabau | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Gear | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rodney Kitley | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Newhall | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emmy Sarah Hames | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Humphries | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Fitzgibbons | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Walford | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|||||
BERYL ELIZABETH BAKER | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.