Trustees TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY IN BRISTOL
Charity number: 900165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Self Bhadra | Chair | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Remigio Amaladipa | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christopher Hewitson | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BROWN | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Advayamati Edwards | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vimala Vajri | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DHARMACHARI SIMHANADA | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shraddhalocani Jackson | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.