Governing document JOHN CABOT ACADEMY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 APRIL 1991, 12 DECEMBER 2000, 17 DECEMBER 2002 AND 9 MAY 2007. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON MANAGING AND DEVELOPING ONE OR MORE SCHOOLS OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON BUT IN NO WAY LIMITED TO SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, AND THEIR PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.