ANIMALS IN DISTRESS (TORBAY AND WEST COUNTRY)

Charity number: 900234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required