Trustees BRISTOL OLD VIC THEATRE SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 900280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Winearls Stobart | Chair | 28 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Faye Lloyd | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert James | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ifeoma Ameke | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Austin Milne | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Eccleson MSc FICA | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan McKen | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
alfred william stuart conner | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
philip alan tanner | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
paul christopher baker | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.