ST MARY'S UNDER FIVES, MARLBOROUGH

Charity number: 900445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £81.87k £89.69k £75.49k £85.17k £97.74k
Total expenditure £74.41k £81.50k £89.95k £93.30k £84.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £67.06k £77.97k N/A
Income from government grants £69.24k £0 N/A N/A N/A