Financial history CREECH ST MICHAEL COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 900518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £73.20k £92.53k £114.49k £116.43k £98.14k
Total expenditure £81.96k £84.32k £95.02k £100.58k £106.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A