BRANSGORE EVENING WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 900613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.02k £4.85k £5.49k £5.43k £1.14k
Total expenditure £6.73k £5.03k £5.45k £5.30k £1.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A