Trustees THE DURSLEY LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Charity number: 900624
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WAUGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Donald Duncan Gibson | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Perrett | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Gough | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Sheppard | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Chamberlain | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Harris | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Dimitri Toffi | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN DOWNTON | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tony Hunt | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Terry Grocutt | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GRAHAM STANNARD | Trustee | 07 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOSTYN OWEN COX | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE LLOYD SOLE | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER NORMAN WHATLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN REGINALD BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD PETTITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN JAMES HUTCHINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN DEREK PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER FRANK COWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD COLIN ROBINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM DONALD SWEET | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARL JOHN SMART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TIM CHAMPION | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH ARTHUR HOGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL JOHN BALDWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEONARD GEORGE FROST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STEVE CLEMENTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.