THE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity number: 286447
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 10 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 12 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 15 December 2016 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 15 December 2016 15 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)