THE A1 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1022834
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 11 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 05 January 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)