THE BEDE GRIFFITHS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1106071
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)