GUILD INITIATIVE FOR FURNITURE TRUST

Charity number: 1015952
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 03 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 03 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 09 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 20 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 09 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 25 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)