THE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE (TEC)

Charity number: 1031482
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

( These accounts
have been qualified)

18 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 24 November 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 24 November 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)