Accounts and annual returns NACRO

Charity number: 226171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 April 2019 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 April 2019 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window