THE PEARS FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1009195
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1 £1,476,760 £976,250 £2,000,000
Other income £13,650,461 £14,925,558 £16,786,472 £17,706,768 £19,191,275
Total expenditure £17,144,452 £16,970,615 £15,336,947 £24,591,692 £20,187,352