THE MAYOR OF LONDON'S FUND FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity number: 1141216
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £150.00k £24.00k £25.00k
Other income £710.43k £473.88k £302.97k £438.18k £426.63k
Total expenditure £729.19k £446.42k £432.41k £449.84k £532.16k