GAY-GLOS

Charity number: 1149572
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1,100 £1,500 £1,500 £1,200 N/A
Other income £13,663 £17,379 £18,690 £23,768 £20,104
Total expenditure £17,580 £18,078 £20,136 £21,407 £17,456