THE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity number: 286447
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £2.00m £2.16m £2.31m £2.99m £2.54m
Total expenditure £1.46m £1.59m £1.63m £1.62m £1.69m