SOUTHAMPTON MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 299426
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £29,477 £18,102 £27,047 £28,697 £16,864
Total expenditure £25,384 £18,627 £32,124 £25,038 £15,240