LOVEWISE

Charity number: 1098210
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £48,859 £40,229 £59,496 £55,734 £58,957
Total expenditure £55,965 £42,982 £42,512 £53,978 £56,755