SWALLOWFIELD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025250
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £41.92k £44.47k £29.15k N/A £35.45k
Other income £29.76k £28.66k £25.29k £62.16k £23.41k
Total expenditure £67.54k £67.44k £59.34k £58.74k £58.83k