BFBS

Charity number: 233480
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £28.32m £24.14m £23.28m £23.02m £22.97m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £1.20m £1.08m £1.46m £3.00m £4.20m
Total expenditure £27.33m £24.96m £24.78m £24.22m £27.42m