THE ECOLOGICAL SEQUESTRATION TRUST

Charity number: 1143397
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £637,102 £0 £76,045 N/A N/A
Other income £321,592 £791,123 £161,855 £188,492 £143,734
Total expenditure £908,430 £1,049,997 £410,043 £247,479 £165,797