CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOLDIERS', SAILORS' & AIRMEN'S CLUBS

Charity number: 226684
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 29TH MAY 1897 AS LAST AMENDED ON THE 14TH JULY 1971 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1901, AS AMENDED 13 NOVEMBER 1996 & 13 NOVEMBER 2002.

Charitable objects

TO OPEN, CARRY ON, ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOLDIERS, SAILORS AND AIRMENS CLUBS. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO HAVE SERVED IN HER MAJESTY'S FORCES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF HOUSING. TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AMONGST THOSE SERVING IN HER MAJESTY'S FORCES.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

GREAT BRITAIN AND OVERSEAS