THE A1 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1022834
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/08/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/06/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/03/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/01/2014

Charitable objects

(1) TO STUDY, RESEARCH, PRESERVE, RESTORE, DESIGN, CONSTRUCT, DEVELOP, ENHANCE, MAINTAIN AND OPERATE STEAM LOCOMOTIVES AND ALL OTHER ASPECTS OF THE RAILWAY HERITAGE OF THE LONDON & NORTH EASTERN RAILWAY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR EDUCATIONAL AND INSTRUCTIONAL PURPOSES, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE COMPANY'S EXISTING PEPPERCORN CLASS A1 LOCOMOTIVE, 'TORNADO' A GRESLEY CLASS P2 LOCOMOTIVE AND THE KYLCHAP DOUBLE BLAST PIPE AND CHIMNEY; AND (2) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE GENERAL, HISTORICAL, ENGINEERING AND SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERTISE REGARDING THE ABOVE RAILWAY HERITAGE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR EDUCATIONAL AND INSTRUCTIONAL PURPOSES.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

NOT DEFINED