THE RAILWAY CHILDREN

Charity number: 1058991
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judith Lister Trustee 03 May 2017 None on record
TIMOTHY HARTLEY Trustee None on record
Tricia Wright Trustee 07 July 2016 None on record
Malcolm Brown Trustee 05 December 2014 None on record
CHRISTINE TAYLOR Trustee 09 July 2015 None on record
Arun Muttreja Trustee 30 December 2013
BRITISH SAFETY COUNCIL
Andrea Minton-Beddoes Trustee 08 November 2018 None on record
Jacob Kelly Trustee 03 December 2015 None on record
HAYDN ABBOTT Chair None on record
TREVOR WINTER Trustee 18 January 2013 None on record
Mohini Bulbrook Trustee 08 November 2018 None on record
Dr Delia-Mara Pop Trustee 08 November 2018 None on record