NATIONAL EMERGENCIES TRUST

Charity number: 1182809
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THELMA STOBER Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Gordon Henry Tempest-Hay Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
GERALD ERNEST OPPENHEIM Trustee 21 March 2019
LONDON EMERGENCIES TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
GENERAL THE LORD FRANCIS RICHARD DANNATT GCBCBEMCDL Chair 25 March 2019
THE NORMANDY MEMORIAL TRUST LTD Charity reporting is up to date
Diana Sarah Fawcett Trustee 14 January 2019 None on record
Carol Jane Mack Trustee 14 January 2019 None on record
JOHN BARRADELL OBE Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Ashley John Head Trustee 05 July 2019
THE BOXING ACADEMY FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Andrew Ian Beeforth OBE Trustee 14 January 2019 None on record
MICHAEL JOHN ADAMSON Trustee 21 March 2019
DISASTERS EMERGENCY COMMITTEE Charity reporting is up to date
CATCH 22 CHARITY LIMITED