GUILD INITIATIVE FOR FURNITURE TRUST

Charity number: 1015952
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TOBY GREAVES Trustee None on record
KEITH SEDGEWICK Trustee 05 May 2011 None on record
ANNE MARGUERITE METCALF FCA DChA Trustee None on record
Peter David Taylor JP Trustee 28 December 1992
THE BRENTWOOD HOUSE TRUST On time
PRESTON RIBBLE METHODIST CIRCUIT On time
COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF LANCASHIRE On time
WILLIAM WILDING GALLOWAY FUND FOR THE PROVISION OF A CHURCH WORKER On time
Peter Robert Metcalf MBE Chair 28 December 1992
PRESTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY On time
PRESTON AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU On time
THE HARRIS CHARITY On time
HARRIS FREE PUBLIC LIBRARY AND MUSEUM ENDOWMENT TRUST On time
JOHN WHITTLE Trustee 23 July 2013
ROPER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION 366 days late
CARL CROMPTON Trustee 23 July 2013 None on record
COUNCILLOR NICHOLAS POMFRET Trustee 15 April 2015 None on record
MARGARET THOMPSON Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
EDWARD LOWES LIMIS Trustee
FULWOOD METHODIST CHURCH On time
PRESTON RIBBLE METHODIST CIRCUIT On time
JONATHON HARISH CHANDRA SAKSENA COUNCILLOR Trustee 10 February 2013 None on record