THE BOOTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1062674
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOSEPH GRAVETT Chair 21 February 2013 None on record
David Briggs Trustee 18 February 2020
WILMSLOW HISTORICAL SOCIETY On time
Andrew Morris Trustee 18 February 2020 None on record
Joshua Graham McGarey Trustee 13 August 2019 None on record
Catherine Bowen-Colthurst Trustee 18 February 2020 None on record
Elena Fowler Trustee 30 May 2017 None on record
Nishi Taylor Trustee 30 May 2017 None on record
Andrew Mullen Trustee 22 October 2013 None on record
Antonia Phoenix Trustee 30 May 2017 None on record
Joanne Wilson Trustee 04 December 2018
MANCHESTER STREET POEM On time
Dr David Andrew Holgate Rev Canon Trustee 27 February 2018 None on record
JOHN ADRIAN GARRARD Trustee None on record