Trustees HOLY TRINITY ROTHWELL TRUST
Charity number: 1011662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Coggins | Chair | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charles Parker | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Marion Clements | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Giard Hawthorn | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Parker | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Cooke | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Saunders | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Christopher Coggins | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cedwien Brown | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.