Governing document FRIENDS OF SHROPSHIRE ARCHIVES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 20 JUNE 1992 AS FURTHER AMENDED 27 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 JUN 2016 as amended on 09 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE PRESERVATION OF SHROPSHIRES RECORDS AND BY THE SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE RECORDS HELD BY SHROPSHIRE COUNTY COUNCIL CURRENTLY THROUGH SHROPSHIRE ARCHIVES THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.