Trustees THE BEACON LODGE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 214402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Anne Roberts | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Zainab Kwaw-Swanzy | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Joy Beasley | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Nicolas | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
Amelia Fincham | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Kirpal Dhadda | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jake Cass | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
SALLY THERESE ATKINSON | Trustee | 10 November 2012 |
|
|||||||
Deborah Langdon-Davies | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.