Governance SAILORS' SOCIETY
Charity number: 237778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 17 December 1964: Standard registration
- 29 December 2011: Funds received from 237778-1 BARK MONEY CHARITY
- 09 October 2012: Funds received from 237778-34 BELFAST ENDOWMENT FUND
- 25 April 2019: Funds received from 1039266 MILFORD HAVEN INTERNATIONAL SEAFARERS' CENTRE
- 16 October 2020: Funds received from 1167934 THE PLYMOUTH MERCHANT NAVY MONUMENT
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- B I S S (Working name)
- BRITISH SAILORS' SOCIETY (Working name)
- BSS (Working name)
- BRITISH AND INTERNATIONAL SAILORS' SOCIETY (Previous name)
- BRITISH SAILORS' SOCIETY AT HOME AND ABROAD INCORPORATED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.