Governance THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 266982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 06 February 1974: Standard registration
- 28 April 2014: Funds received from 1073894 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LISS & DISTRICT BRANCH
- 24 July 2015: Funds received from 1071317 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HAVANT BRANCH
- 08 January 2016: Funds received from 1071207 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION MANOR PARK BRANCH
- 04 March 2019: Funds received from 1072494 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HALIFAX BRANCH
- 15 November 2021: Funds received from 1068495 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HEREFORD BRANCH
- 11 January 2023: Funds received from 1069176 WIGSTON & DISTRICT BRANCH ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION
- 02 February 2024: Funds received from 1068802 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION CHESTER BRANCH
- 14 February 2024: Funds received from 1077782 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION DRIFFIELD BRANCH
- 16 February 2024: Funds received from 1064972 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION (DEAL & WALMER BRANCH)
- 16 February 2024: Funds received from 1071645 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION BIRMINGHAM SHELDON BRANCH
- 22 February 2024: Funds received from 1070953 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION BROMLEY BRANCH
- 22 February 2024: Funds received from 1068282 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION NUMBER 2 AREA
- 14 March 2024: Funds received from 1068800 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION PADDOCK WOOD BRANCH
- 14 March 2024: Funds received from 1068800 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION PADDOCK WOOD BRANCH
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.