Trustees THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 266982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STANLEY KEITH RIDLEY | Chair | 21 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Andrew Christie | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Elliot | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stirling Simmons | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roslyn Hastie-Murray | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Chivers | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Warwick Ian Belfitt | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Louise Robson | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Lance Higgon-Young | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Vice Admiral Duncan Laurence Potts CB | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Irvin | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ernest Godwin | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stephenson | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Mark Slawson OBE | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Marguarita Lock MBE | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH CRAWFORD MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAURICE FOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.