Trustees DEVELOPMENT STUDIES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 283670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Emma Mawdsley | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Eyob Balcha Gebremariam | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Zechariahs Benapugha Owutuamor | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Touseef Yousuf Mir | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Chebet Ronoh | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Michael Jennings | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ingrid Kvangraven | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Indrajit Roy | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Prof Shailaja Fennell | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Prof Peter Taylor | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Annalisa Prizzon | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jonathan Fisher | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Naila Kabeer | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Prof Uma Kambhampati | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof Laura Emma Camfield | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.